Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2024 9:40:25 PM
Tuesday, April 2, 2024
Senate
Created: 3/21/2024 3:31 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Wilkins, et al

Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases and Holdover Tenancies - Local Good Cause Termination Provisions
(Added - 3/22/2024 3:25 PM)
Del Shetty, et al

Family Law - Protective Orders - Stalking and Permanent Protective Orders
(Added - 3/21/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Stewart, et al

Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
(Added - 3/22/2024 3:25 PM)
Sen Muse

Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sens Kramer and West

Criminal Law - Cruelty to Law Enforcement Animals - Recklessness
Sen Muse

Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act)
Sen Folden

Frederick County - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sen Benson

Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit
The Spkr (Dept), et al

Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
(Removed - 3/21/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Shetty, et al

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
(Removed - 3/29/2024 2:38 PM)

Created: 4/1/2024 8:56 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page