Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/16/2024 9:27:40 PM
Tuesday, May 7, 2024
Senate
Created: 5/3/2024 7:02 AM
Finance Committee
1:00 PM - Site Visit
Joint with Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation and the Environment
Key Bridge Site Visit

House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 5/2/2024 12:08 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
1:00 PM - Site Visit
Joint with the Senate Finance Committee
Key Bridge Site Visit

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 1/4/2024 12:40 PM
5:30 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Click to return on the top page