Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 6/23/2021 2:52:50 AM
Thursday, June 10, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 5/25/2021 2:19 PM
Tuesday, June 1, 2021 1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
On going review of Maryland Environmental Service Personnel and Board Practices.
(Added - 5/26/2021 8:57 AM)

Click to return on the top page