Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 9/19/2021 6:53:57 AM
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 7/15/2021 8:56 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Primary and Secondary School Re-opening

Created: 7/16/2021 9:52 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee
Created: 7/30/2021 11:53 AM
Work Session
10:00 AM to 1:00 PM - Closed Meeting
Work Session

Board of Public Works
Created: 7/8/2021 9:47 AM
10:00 AM - Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
General Meeting and Bond Sale

Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Created: 7/29/2021 4:04 PM
1:00 PM - Conference Room Side A, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Joint Meeting with the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
To participate virtually click here
Dial in Number: 1-617-675-4444
Passcode: 343 243 858 2671#
Agenda and additional meeting information will be posted on the CHRC website: https://health.maryland.gov/mchrc/Pages/Home.aspx
Initial meeting of the Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee (joint with CHRC Commissioners).

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 7/29/2021 3:53 PM
10:30 AM - Conference Room Side A, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
To participate virtually, click here
Dial in Number: 1-617-675-4444
Passcode: 695 976 467 5275#
Agenda and additional meeting information will be posted on the CHRC website: https://health.maryland.gov/mchrc/Pages/home.aspx
Regular meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Maryland Insurance Administration
Created: 7/13/2021 4:00 PM
1:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Dial-In: (833)-568-8864 (toll free)
Webinar ID: 161 732 3284
The Maryland Insurance Administration will conduct a public hearing on specific rate increase requests being made by certain long-term care insurance carriers operating in Maryland.
(Added - 7/14/2021 10:53 AM)
Please note that this hearing will be held via ZOOM.
The rate increase requests are from Genworth Life Insurance Company and Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America.
(Added - 7/14/2021 10:53 AM)
The purpose of the hearing is for insurance company officials to explain their reasons for rate increases and to explain the new benefit options.
The Maryland Insurance Administration will conduct a public hearing on specific rate increase requests being made by certain long-term care insurance carriers operating in Maryland.
(Removed - 7/14/2021 10:53 AM)
The rate increase requests are from Genworth Life Insurance Company.
(Removed - 7/14/2021 10:53 AM)

Click to return on the top page