Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/17/2021 2:39:27 AM
Monday, September 13, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Created: 8/30/2021 8:21 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Consumer Outreach & Community Engagement Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 994 1097 2483 Passcode: 877805
Dial-in: 1-301-715-8592
Meeting ID: 994 1097 2483 Passcode: 877805
Meeting of the Consumer Outreach & Community Engagement Subcommittee of the Health Equity Resource Communities Advisory Committee.

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 8/9/2021 4:19 PM
11:30 AM - The Music Center Lobby at Strathmore, 5301 Tuckerman Lane, N. Bethesda, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce.

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Created: 9/8/2021 9:53 AM
3:00 PM - Conference Call
Dial-in Phone #: +1 612-326-1129
PIN: 239 452 318#
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board

State Transparency and Accountability Reform (STAR) Commission
Created: 9/8/2021 1:56 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Commission Meeting

Click to return on the top page