Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/17/2021 2:40:44 AM
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 9/10/2021 4:43 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
1:00 PM - Site Visit
Morgan State University
1600 Haven Road
Baltimore, MD 21251

Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Canceled
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 9/9/2021 9:42 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
2:00 PM - Site Visit
Tour of Marian House
949 Gorusch Ave.
Baltimore, MD 21218
Additional presentations at the site by Baltimore Crisis Response, Inc., Behavioral Health System Maryland, and Serving Together.

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Canceled
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD

Created: 9/9/2021 9:38 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
2:00 PM - Site Visit
Tour of Port of Baltimore
2001 Broening Highway
Baltimore, MD 21224

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 7/9/2021 1:29 PM
5:30 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
5:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
The MSCCSP will meet via videoconference.
To reach the livestream link click here
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Created: 8/30/2021 8:56 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Public Hearing
Re: Emergency Regulations: DLS Control No. 21-110E
State Board of Education: State School Administration
Educational Equity: COMAR 13A.01.06.01 through .04

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 7/27/2021 8:24 AM
Thursday, September 16, 2021 10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health
Introduction and Presentation by Nancy Brown, Division Chief of Evaluation, Research, and Data Analytics, Maryland Medicaid Office of Innovation, Research, and Development.
(Added - 9/10/2021 11:57 AM)

Transforming Manufacturing Workgroup
Created: 9/7/2021 10:08 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 6751 Columbia Gateway Dr., Columbia, MD
To participate virtually click here
Dial-in #: 484-531-2264
PIN: 234 0850996#
Overview of Workgroup Purposes and Objectives.

Click to return on the top page