Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/17/2021 2:42:01 AM
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/19/2021 2:08 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- Follow-up on HB1121 of 2020 (Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System)
- Suicide Rates in Maryland

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 8/17/2021 4:21 PM
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Created: 9/9/2021 1:24 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Pathways Call for Proposals/Design Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 965 8741 6051 Passcode: 731460
Dial-In: 1-301-715-8592
Meeting ID: 965 8741 6051 Passcode: 731460
Meeting of the Pathways Call for Proposals/Design Subcommittee

Click to return on the top page