Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/17/2021 3:23:10 AM
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
Senate
Created: 8/18/2021 8:46 AM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Medicaid Briefing: Update from the Maryland Department of Health

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Created: 8/24/2021 1:59 PM
10:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Second Meeting

Economic Stability, House Study Group on
Created: 9/10/2021 12:24 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Discuss plans for the 2022 Session.

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 9/21/2021 11:57 AM
2:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1) State Legacy Systems
2) Cybersecurity Best Practices

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/17/2021 4:18 PM
5:00 PM to 7:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Western Maryland Redistricting Hearing
Allegany College of Maryland, College Center Theatre, 12401 Willowbrook Road, Cumberland, MD 21502
Meeting Agenda
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Meeting Material #3
Meeting Material #4
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page