Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 11/30/2021 5:48:10 AM
Wednesday, October 6, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 8/17/2021 4:24 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 9/23/2021 2:29 PM
9:30 AM to 11:30 AM - Frostburg State University, Room 397, Gira Building
Phone Link: 440-688-1212
PIN 241 846 882#
Note for in-person attendees: Masks are required and attendees must check in first using this link
Discuss recommendations for upcoming legislative session and final report.

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 9/20/2021 10:05 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefings on long-term care issues affecting families.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 9/24/2021 1:20 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Dial-in Number: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 9/28/2021 4:41 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Dial-in Phone: 301-715-8592
Waiting Room Opens at 8:30 a.m.
Open Meeting of the Full Authority + Closed Executive Session

Click to return on the top page