Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/5/2022 1:16:40 PM
Thursday, October 13, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Canceled
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Further discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

Created: 10/12/2022 5:52 PM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Further discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/6/2022 4:05 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 889 8877 0209 Passcode: 929230 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 10/6/2022 4:12 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 9/29/2022 12:00 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here
and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at https://mdschoolconstruction.org.
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page