Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/5/2022 1:20:13 PM
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
Senate
Created: 8/30/2022 11:21 AM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the Federal Inflation Reduction Act

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 9/6/2022 9:36 AM
10:30 AM to 12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Email lonia@cashmd.org to RSVP.
Meeting to receive an update from SPIN.

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 10/11/2022 3:15 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
2022 Interim Organizational Meeting
Overview of House Bills 1 and 837
Update on Report for Merger Recommendations from Will Tilburg, Executive Director, Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission and Jeffrey Kelly, Maryland Alcohol and Tobacco Commission

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 10/6/2022 4:21 PM
9:30 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
UMBC Tech Center, Main Seminar Room, 1450 S. Rolling Road, Halethorpe, MD
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 871 3500 5022 Passcode: 803242 Dial-In #: 301-715-859
Space is limited. Members of the public who wish to attend should register here
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium)

Click to return on the top page