Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/9/2023 11:46:34 PM
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 10/3/2023 2:51 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Local Management Boards
Protecting Children who are in Out-of-Home Placements

Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 9/13/2023 11:16 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Update on the Public Employee Relations Act.
Discrimination protections for the hiring of State employees based on prior criminal records.
Use of State procurement law to contract out work usually done by State employees.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 10/6/2023 11:09 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube
For more details see the Commission webpage

Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys, Task Force to Study
Created: 9/26/2023 4:56 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Existing Data Transparency Policies and Best Practices.

Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on
Created: 9/28/2023 2:51 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Written public comments for circulation to Commission members can be sent to TrainCommission@mlis.state.md.us
Meeting Materials

Click to return on the top page