Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/10/2023 12:02:16 AM
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 3/24/2023 2:58 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 10/4/2023 11:57 AM
9:00 AM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
9:30 AM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will cover policy issues related to the use of artificial intelligence, including education, labor, consumer protection, elections, governance, and general use by government entities.
(Added - 10/17/2023 3:38 PM)
The meeting will cover policy issues related to the use of artificial intelligence, including education, labor, consumer protection, health, and elections.
(Removed - 10/17/2023 3:38 PM)

Click to return on the top page