Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/5/2022 1:44:40 PM
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 10/20/2022 12:40 PM
4:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Blueprint AIB Pillar 4 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
Meeting Agenda

Board of Public Works
Created: 7/29/2022 12:44 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 10/6/2022 4:57 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 471 747 7346 Passcode: Xkie4R Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 2/7/2022 10:09 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
To Join by Phone: +1-424-570-4302 PIN: 287-954-497#
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page