Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/26/2024 11:59:16 AM
Wednesday, November 8, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/13/2023 4:12 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Court-Imposed Mandatory Fines & Fees Briefing
Maryland Judiciary
Maryland Legal Aid
Baltimoreans United In Leadership Development

Created: 10/13/2023 4:13 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Juvenile Justice Briefing
The Office of The Attorney General of Maryland - Juvenile Justice Monitoring Unit
Members of the Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Background and technical information on the recommendations of the council, which was established by HB606/SB856 during the 2019 session.
The Fraternal Order of Police
(Added - 11/7/2023 12:49 PM)
The Fraternal Order of Police
(Removed - 11/3/2023 11:52 AM)

Other
Apprenticeship 2030 Commission
Created: 9/15/2023 4:16 PM
1:00 PM to 4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
For more details see the Commission's webpage
Meeting Agenda

Board of Public Works
Created: 3/24/2023 4:05 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Canceled
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
In Person Meeting of Full Authority + Closed Executive Session

Click to return on the top page