Day(s)
As of: 5/9/2025 12:33:16 PM
Created: 10/12/2021 1:50 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
Tuesday, November 2, 2021
3:00 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overiew of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.
Created: 10/14/2021 10:34 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.
Canceled
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting materials and additional information can be found on the Commission's website here
Decision Meeting
Created: 9/27/2021 1:40 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Business Implementation and Regulation.
Presentation from the Department of Budget and Management Audit Compliance Unit.
(Added - 10/13/2021 10:42 AM)
Follow-up hearing on fiscal compliance audit of the Department of Human Services-Social Services Administration (June 2021).
(Added - 10/13/2021 10:42 AM)
A discussion of State Security laws and other issues.
Legislative and Advocate Updates
Created: 10/25/2021 8:47 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Dial-in: (301) 715-8592 Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Dial-in: (301) 715-8592 Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.
CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 4 meeting at Governor's Hall at Sailwinds.
Created: 11/8/2021 10:05 AM
4:30 PM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
College of Southern Maryland-Prince Frederick Campus, Building B, Room 104/105
115 JW Williams Road, Prince Frederick, MD 20687
Registration Encouraged
The College of Southern Maryland has requested that in-person attendees complete a COVID Self-Assessment
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
Dial-in # 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
College of Southern Maryland-Prince Frederick Campus, Building B, Room 104/105
115 JW Williams Road, Prince Frederick, MD 20687
Registration Encouraged
The College of Southern Maryland has requested that in-person attendees complete a COVID Self-Assessment
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
Dial-in # 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.
Baltimore City Department of Recreation and Parks invited speaker presentation and discussion.
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools