Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2022 5:48:43 AM
Tuesday, November 9, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/12/2021 1:50 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
Tuesday, November 2, 2021 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overiew of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget

House
Created: 10/21/2021 11:55 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.

Created: 10/14/2021 10:34 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.

Other
Governor's Salary Commission
Canceled
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting materials and additional information can be found on the Commission's website here
Decision Meeting

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 9/27/2021 1:40 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Business Implementation and Regulation.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 7/29/2021 4:27 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation from the Department of Budget and Management Audit Compliance Unit.
(Added - 10/13/2021 10:42 AM)
Follow-up hearing on fiscal compliance audit of the Department of Human Services-Social Services Administration (June 2021).
(Added - 10/13/2021 10:42 AM)

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 10/20/2021 2:56 PM
10:00 AM to 12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
A discussion of State Security laws and other issues.

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 8/10/2021 1:08 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Legislative and Advocate Updates

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/25/2021 8:47 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Dial-in: (301) 715-8592 Meeting ID: 949 8148 1656 Passcode: 060628
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.
CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 4 meeting at Governor's Hall at Sailwinds.

Created: 11/8/2021 10:05 AM
4:30 PM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
College of Southern Maryland-Prince Frederick Campus, Building B, Room 104/105
115 JW Williams Road, Prince Frederick, MD 20687
Registration Encouraged
The College of Southern Maryland has requested that in-person attendees complete a COVID Self-Assessment
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
Dial-in # 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 964 1701 9468 Passcode: 490483
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 9/8/2021 3:10 PM
Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.

State Park Investment Commission
Created: 10/28/2021 1:38 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Department of Recreation and Parks invited speaker presentation and discussion.

Click to return on the top page