Day(s)
As of: 5/9/2025 12:19:14 PM
All day site visit to Morgan State University and Tradepoint Atlantic at Sparrows Point.
Created: 10/20/2021 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
School Bus Driver Shortages, School Bus Routes, and Electric School Bus Vehicles
Created: 10/20/2021 4:15 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.
Briefings on the impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic on child care in Maryland.
Created: 9/20/2021 10:49 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Howard County Redistricting Hearing
Howard Community College, Monteabaro Recital Hall of the Horowitz Visual and Performing Arts Center,10901 Little Patuxent Parkway, Columbia, MD 21044
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Howard Community College, Monteabaro Recital Hall of the Horowitz Visual and Performing Arts Center,10901 Little Patuxent Parkway, Columbia, MD 21044
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Legislative Redistricting
Created: 11/8/2021 1:43 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcode: 097292
Dial-in #: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcaode: 097292
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcode: 097292
Dial-in #: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcaode: 097292
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 9 meeting at the College of Southern Maryland.
Created: 7/20/2021 4:12 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Regularly Scheduled Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools