Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/10/2022 1:05:44 AM
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 11/12/2020 2:55 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
3:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland School for the Blind's Joint Chair Report on Financial Projections

Created: 11/2/2020 12:36 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Energy Capacity and Labor Issues

House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 11/6/2020 4:04 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health on Optum

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 11/12/2020 3:25 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
3:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland School for the Blind’s Joint Chairmen's Report on Financial Projections

Created: 11/5/2020 9:22 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
- Hospitals: Financial Assistance and Medical Debt Collection Policies
- Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health on Optum (Members of the House Appropriations Health and Social Services Subcommittee will participate)

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page