Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2022 6:34:25 AM
Thursday, November 18, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 11/8/2021 9:46 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Board Requested Legislation
2021 Actuarial Valuation and 2023 Contribution Rates
Update on 2021 Legislation
Briefing on Retirement Trends
Comments by Employee Unions

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 11:24 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Harford and Cecil County Redistricting Hearing
Cecil College, Millburn Stone Theatre, One Seahawk Drive, North East, MD 21901
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Legislative Redistricting

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 11/8/2021 8:44 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
To join the meeting click here
TBD

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2021 2:40 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Meeting to fulfill the mandate of House Bill 681.

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 7/27/2021 8:26 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
For additional information click here
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 10/18/2021 2:49 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 11/4/2021 8:07 AM
8:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins. Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures. Click here
to see the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page