Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 7:08:57 AM
Created: 10/12/2022 2:08 PM
5:00 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
The Maryland State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy (MSCCSP) invites public comment on criminal sentencing policy-related issues. Those who wish to speak at the hearing should limit comments to five minutes and register and submit their written comments by December 2, 2022 to David Soule at dsoule@umd.edu
Anyone who wishes to observe may view the live stream by clicking here
Anyone who wishes to observe may view the live stream by clicking here
Created: 10/12/2022 2:15 PM
6:30 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
Anyone wishing to simply observe the live stream may click here
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.
Audit: Part 1 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
Audit: Part 2 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
Office of Legislative Audits (OLA): Fraud Investigation Unit Update and Results
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
OLA: Report on Follow-up Process and Repeat Audit Findings
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
OLA: Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Committee Action
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
TBD
(Removed - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
Review of recent legislation impacting children, youth, and families in Maryland.
Created: 11/28/2022 3:24 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Board Requested Legislation
2021 Actuarial Valuation and 2023 Contribution Rates
Discussion of Amortization Policy
Created: 11/2/2022 2:53 PM
8:00 AM - Senate and House Chambers, The State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Orientation program for newly elected legislators.