Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/30/2023 6:58:33 AM
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 12/8/2022 1:11 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation on Cannabis Legalization and Impacts on Workplace Policy, Laws, and Safety.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/22/2022 2:58 PM
9:30 AM - UMBC Tech Center, Main Seminar Room, 1450 S. Rolling Road, Halethorpe, MD
Hearing Video
Meeting ID: 8243233 3052 Passcode: 256556 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Members of the public wishing to attend in person are asked to register. There is no cost to attend. To register click here
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium).

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 11/14/2022 8:00 AM
12:00 PM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce and the Governor's Subcabinet on Infrastructure.

Click to return on the top page