Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/29/2024 4:40:44 PM
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 3/24/2023 4:12 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 9/21/2023 3:38 PM
10:00 AM - Location-TBD
9:00 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Office of Legislative Audits
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Audit: Maryland Department of Health-Medical Care Programs Administration (November 2023)
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Audit: Maryland Department of Health-Office of the Secretary and Other Units (October 2023)
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Special Review: Maryland Transportation Authority (March 2023)
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Update: Maryland Department of Labor-Division of Unemployment Insurance
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Update: Department of Budget and Management-Audit and Finance Compliance Unit
(Added - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD
(Removed - 12/1/2023 12:05 PM)

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 11/28/2023 2:04 PM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
In Person Meeting of Full Authority+Closed Executive Session.

Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on

Click to return on the top page