Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/30/2023 7:00:38 AM
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 12/12/2022 11:41 AM
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
AIB Pillar 2 Advisory Committee Meeting
Meeting Video

Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 11/28/2022 3:26 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Investment Overview
Decisions

No. 5 - Howard County
Created: 12/12/2022 12:22 PM
7:00 PM to 11:00 PM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
Meeting of Howard County Senate and House Delegations
Banneker Room, George Howard Building
3430 Court House Dr., Ellicott City, MD 21043
The meeting will be livestreamed from 7 pm until 11pm and the signup form will be available from 6 pm on December 12th until 6:30 pm on December 14th. To reach the meeting and the sign up sheet click on the "Meeting Agenda" below and follow the links.
Meeting Agenda

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 12/2/2022 8:19 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube. For more details click here

Click to return on the top page