Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/29/2024 4:42:36 PM
Thursday, December 14, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 12/1/2023 9:23 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
To view the video link, agenda, and meeting materials to be posted prior to the meeting, click here.
Board Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 7/14/2023 1:23 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business and approval of 75% of the Capital Imrprovement Program.

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 8/14/2023 3:14 PM
4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Decision Meeting

Click to return on the top page