Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2022 6:56:03 AM
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 11/18/2021 3:39 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland’s Reinsurance Program
(Added - 11/18/2021 4:16 PM)
Implementation of Health Equity Resource Communities and Shirley Nathan Pulliam Health Equity Act
(Added - 11/18/2021 4:16 PM)
Implementation of Health Enterprise Resource Communities (HB463 of 2021) and Shirley Nathan Pulliam Health Equity Act (HB78 of 2021)
(Removed - 11/18/2021 4:16 PM)
Maryland’s Reinsurance Program
(Removed - 11/18/2021 4:16 PM)

Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 11/29/2021 10:05 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Board of Public Works
Created: 10/21/2021 12:57 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 10/28/2021 9:58 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decision Meeting

Click to return on the top page