Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2022 7:13:39 AM
Monday, December 20, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today (BOOST) Advisory Board
Created: 11/22/2021 3:23 PM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting number: 2429 169 0648 Password:n7nSPDHYs73
To join by phone: 1-855-797-9480 (Toll Free) or +1-415-655-0045 (Toll) Access Code: 242 926 90648
The Board to review remaining funds for consideration and award allocations.

House Judicial Transparency Workgroup
Created: 12/10/2021 2:40 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
4:01 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 12/16/2021 3:53 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins. Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act Procedures
Click here to see the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page