HB0448 (SB0387)
|
Korean American Day |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0504 (SB0596)
|
Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation to the Marilyn Hatza Memorial Strengthening the Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB0561 (SB0683)
|
Tree Expert Licenses - Application and Renewal Fee Alterations and Insurance Requirements |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/16/2024 - 12:30 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0394 (SB0050)
|
Human Relations - Commission on Civil Rights - Appeal of Final Orders |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0403 (SB0443)
|
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Judiciary
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0412
|
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0488 (SB0181)
|
Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations - Training and Reentry Services - Funding |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0509 (SB0599)
|
Developmental Disabilities - Community Providers - Federal Participation for Local Funds |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0567 (SB0541)
|
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0601 (SB0442)
|
Street Racing and Exhibition Driving – Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0640 (SB0869)
|
Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Ways and Means
|
|
HB0645 (SB1162)
|
Social Media Platforms - Vloggers and Video Content Featuring Minors |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0692 (SB0985)
|
Economic Development - County or Municipality Economic Development Authority - Powers and Use of Proceeds |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
- Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Environment and Transportation
|
|
HB0872
|
Election Law – Campaign Materials – Disclosure of Use of Synthetic Media |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0903 (SB0797)
|
Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB1092 (SB0649)
|
9-1-1 Trust Fund - Purposes - Training in Telecommunications Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1129 (SB0902)
|
Wildlife - Protections and Highway Crossings |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1206
|
Maryland-Ireland Trade Commission - Establishment |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1304
|
Maryland Department of Health and Department of Aging - Earned Income Tax Credit - Distribution of Information and Training |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1438 (SB0958)
|
Responding to Emergency Needs From Extreme Weather (RENEW) Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
|
- Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Environment and Transportation
|
|
HJ0001 (SJ0001)
|
Affirming the Federal Equal Rights Amendment |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HJ0009
|
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0513 /CH0017 (SB0479)
|
Motor Vehicles - Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Revisions (Maryland Road Worker Protection Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0575 (SB0471)
|
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0576 (SB0453)
|
Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0579 (SB0474)
|
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Related Approvals – Definition of Generating Station (Critical Infrastructure Streamlining Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Economic Matters
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0581 (SB0472)
|
State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0583 (SB0475)
|
Center for Firearm Violence Prevention and Intervention - Establishment |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0584 /CH0013 (SB0476/CH0014)
|
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders (Caring for Public Employees in the Safety Professions - CAPES Act) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
|
- Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0585 /CH0021 (SB0480/CH0020)
|
Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024 |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0597 (SB0470)
|
Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0599 (SB0483)
|
Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Ways and Means
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB0694 (SB0482)
|
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
- Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM -
Health and Government Operations
|
|
HB0693 (SB0481)
|
Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024 |
By Request - Departmental
|
5 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Judiciary
|
- Judicial Proceedings
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|