Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Senator Paul D. Corderman

Corderman, Paul D.
District
2
County
Washington and Frederick
Committee Assignment(s)
Budget and Taxation Committee
Annapolis Info
403 James Senate Office Building
11 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3903 | 301-858-3903
Toll-free in MD 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3903
Interim Info
P.O.Box 3716
Hagerstown, MD 21742
Phone 410-841-3903 | 240-313-3929
Contact
paul.corderman@senate.state.md.us
Subscribe to My Newsletter
Party
Republican
District 2
Corderman, Paul D.
Tenure
Member of the Maryland Senate since September 1, 2020. First elected to the Senate in November 2022. Member of the Maryland House of Delegates from December 20, 2017 to August 31, 2020.
Current Assignments
2021 Budget and Taxation Committee
2023 Capital Budget Subcommittee of the Budget and Taxation Committee
2021 Education, Business, and Administration Subcommittee of the Budget and Taxation Committee
2023 Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
2023 Spending Affordability Committee
Past Senate Service
Pensions Subcommittee of the Budget and Taxation Committee, 2021-2023.
Past House Service 2017-2020
Appropriations Committee, 2019-2020; Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee, 2019-2020; Oversight Committee on Pensions of the Appropriations Committee, 2019-2020; Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds, 2019-2020; Judiciary Committee, 2017-2019; Criminal Justice Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee, 2018-2019; Joint Committee on Pensions, 2020.
Public Service
Task Force to Study Nonpublic Student Bus Transportation, 2023-; COVID-19 Access to Justice Task Force, 2020; Main Street Design Committee, Hagerstown, Maryland.
Biographical Information
Born in Hagerstown, Maryland, September 1, 1977; Attended North Hagerstown High School, Hagerstown, Maryland; University of Maryland, College Park, B.A., Criminal Justice, 2000; Hagerstown City Council, 2016-2017; Repair Coordinator, Progressive Insurance 2003-2013; Shop Manager, Mace Auto Body, Smithsburg, Maryland, 2013 - 2019; Member, Hagerstown City Council, 2016-2017; Married; one child.
Last Updated: 4/22/2024 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page