HB0125 (SB0159)
|
Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0140
|
State Personnel - Spouses of Active Duty Service Members - Hiring Preferences |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Appropriations
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0709 (SB0462)
|
Licensed Real Estate Brokers - Branch Offices - Designation of Managers |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
- Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0710 (SB0559)
|
Business Regulation – Household Goods Movers – Special Fund and Fees |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
|
- Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0819 (SB0628)
|
State Finance – Catastrophic Event Account and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund – Noncivilian Federal Employees |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Appropriations
|
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB0952
|
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement (Keep Our Heroes Home Act) |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1145 (SB0844)
|
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1162 (SB1034)
|
9-1-1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1197
|
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1491 (SB0467)
|
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Prince Hall Day |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1492 (SB1042)
|
Education - Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery - Student Information |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
|
|
HB0431 (SB0411)
|
Department of Veterans Affairs - Renaming and Deputy Secretary of Military Family Policy and Programs |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0465 (SB0436)
|
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
|
- Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0493 (SB0823)
|
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Faculty, Part-Time Faculty, Post Doctoral Associates, and Graduate Assistants |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
|
- Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
|
HB0541 (SB0657)
|
Anne Arundel County - Student Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Educators - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0598 (SB0413)
|
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0696 (SB0579)
|
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0713
|
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Military Retirement Income - Individuals Under the Age of 55 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0715 (SB0533)
|
Fishing and Hunting Licenses and Trout Stamps - Complimentary Licenses and Stamp Exemption - Veterans Determined to be Unemployable |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1026 (SB0707)
|
Armed Forces - Support of Military Families and Addition of Space Force |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1210
|
Income Tax - Credit for Cybersecurity Measures Undertaken by Small Businesses |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1220 (SB0960)
|
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Climate Technology Founder's Fund |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1244 (SB1022)
|
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
|
- Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1459
|
Vehicle Registration - Fee Exemptions - Military Honorees |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
HB1522
|
University of Maryland Eastern Shore - Land-Grant Institution - Funding (Land-Grant Equity and Accountability Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
|
- Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
|
|
HJ0008
|
Condemning Islamophobia, Anti-Palestinian Hate, and Antisemitism |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0538 (SB0484)
|
Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-36)
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0579 (SB0474)
|
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Related Approvals – Definition of Generating Station (Critical Infrastructure Streamlining Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Economic Matters
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0580 (SB0477)
|
Time to Serve Act of 2024 |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0584 (SB0476)
|
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders (Caring for Public Employees in the Safety Professions - CAPES Act) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
|
- Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0604 (SB0478)
|
Families Serve Act of 2024 |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
|
- Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0694 (SB0482)
|
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024) |
By Request - Administration
|
3 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
- Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM -
Health and Government Operations
|
|
HB0693 (SB0481)
|
Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024 |
By Request - Departmental
|
5 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Judiciary
|
- Judicial Proceedings
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|