Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Floor Actions

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number
February 21, 2024 February 13, 2024 29
February 20, 2024 February 12, 2024 28
February 19, 2024 February 11, 2024 27-B
February 19, 2024 February 11, 2024 27-A
February 16, 2024 February 11, 2024 27 (Journalized)
February 15, 2024 February 10, 2024 26 (Journalized)
February 14, 2024 February 9, 2024 25 (Journalized)
February 13, 2024 February 8, 2024 24 (Journalized)
February 12, 2024 February 7, 2024 23 (Journalized)
February 9, 2024 February 6, 2024 22 (Journalized)
February 8, 2024 February 5, 2024 21 (Journalized)
February 7, 2024 February 4, 2024 20-A
February 7, 2024 February 4, 2024 20 (Journalized)
February 6, 2024 February 3, 2024 19 (Journalized)
February 5, 2024 February 2, 2024 18-A (Journalized)
February 2, 2024 February 2, 2024 18 (Journalized)
February 1, 2024 February 1, 2024 17 (Journalized)
January 31, 2024 January 31, 2024 16 (Journalized)
January 30, 2024 January 30, 2024 15 (Journalized)
January 29, 2024 January 29, 2024 14 (Journalized)
January 26, 2024 January 26, 2024 13 (Journalized)
January 25, 2024 January 25, 2024 12 (Journalized)
January 24, 2024 January 24, 2024 11 (Journalized)
January 23, 2024 January 23, 2024 10 (Journalized)
January 22, 2024 January 22, 2024 9 (Journalized)
January 19, 2024 January 19, 2024 8 (Journalized)
January 18, 2024 January 18, 2024 7 (Journalized)
January 17, 2024 January 17, 2024 6 (Journalized)
January 16, 2024 January 16, 2024 5 (Journalized)
January 15, 2024 January 15, 2024 4 (Journalized)
January 12, 2024 January 12, 2024 3 (Journalized)
January 11, 2024 January 11, 2024 2 (Journalized)
January 10, 2024 January 10, 2024 1 (Journalized)
Click to return on the top page