Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 6
Status as of April 5, 2005: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 12, 2005: Became Law - Chapter 90
Status as of April 12, 2005: Became Law - Chapter 92
Status as of May 26, 2005: Became Law - Chapter 466
Status as of March 21, 2005: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 25, 2005: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs