Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 7
Status as of February 16, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary
Status as of March 23, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary
Status as of February 23, 2009: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Judiciary
Status as of February 5, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Judicial Proceedings
Status as of February 23, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 202
Status as of March 17, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings