Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 6
Status as of April 11, 2006: Became Law - Chapter 92
Status as of May 2, 2006: Became Law - Chapter 351
Status as of April 25, 2006: Became Law - Chapter 200
Status as of February 15, 2006: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary
Status as of May 16, 2006: Became Law - Chapter 501
Status as of May 26, 2006: Vetoed by the Governor - Duplicative