Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 507

File Code: Public Safety Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 652
Sponsored By:
Delegates Branch, Anderson, Arora, Barnes, Dumais, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Love, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, and Simmons
Entitled:
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports

Synopsis:

Requiring a law enforcement agency that issues electronic control devices (ECDs) to its law enforcement officers to report annually on or before March 31 to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, information for each time a law enforcement officer discharges an ECD except during training, using a specified format; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to analyze and summarize reports and to submit an annual report to the Governor, the General Assembly, and each law enforcement agency; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/7
First Reading Judiciary
2/9
Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14

Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/15
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/17
Third Reading Passed (94-46)
4/2
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/18
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/12
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 79

Sponsored by:

Delegate Talmadge Branch, District 45
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Sam Arora, District 19
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Kathleen M. Dumais, District 15
Delegate Jim Gilchrist, District 17
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Ariana B. Kelly, District 16
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Luiz R. S. Simmons, District 17

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Police Training Commission
Public Information
Reports
Sunset
Weapons -see also- Guns

Bill affects the following Statute:

Public Safety
( 3-508 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 652612/01     Offered on: March 15, 2011   at: 10:30 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 438674/01     Offered on: April 4, 2011   at: 10:04 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Judiciary
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 17, 2011: Third Reading Passed (94-46)
April 2, 2011: Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Senate
April 1, 2011: Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Click to return on the top page