Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 463

File Code: Insurance - Other than Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 297
Sponsored By:
Delegate Rudolph
Entitled:
Property and Casualty Insurance - Certificates of Insurance and Certificate of Insurance Forms

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a person from preparing or issuing or requiring the preparation or issuance of a certificate of insurance unless the certificate of insurance form has been filed with and approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; providing an exception; prohibiting a person from altering or modifying an approved certificate of insurance; requiring the Commissioner to disapprove a certificate of insurance form or withdraw approval of a certificate of insurance form under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
2/2
First Reading Economic Matters
2/7
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13

Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/14
Favorable with Amendments {363199/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/16
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/1
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/16
First Reading Finance
3/21
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27
Favorable with Amendments {227273/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 480

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Agents and Brokers
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Forms
Insurance Administration
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Real Property
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statute:

Insurance
( 19-116 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 363199/01     Offered on: March 14, 2012   at: 10:23 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 227273/01     Offered on: April 2, 2012   at: 10:18 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Economic Matters
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 16, 2012: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
April 1, 2012: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
March 30, 2012: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page