Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


House Agenda for Proceedings No. 63

Proceedings
 
APRIL 4, 2013 - Session 2
MESSAGE FROM THE SENATE: YEAS AND NAYS # 11Completed
JUDICIARY COMMITTEE REPORT NO. 13-019Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 50Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 61Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 62Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 63Completed
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 68Completed
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 69Completed
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 24Completed
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 25Completed
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 29Completed
MESSAGE FROM THE SENATE: CONCURRENCE # 3Completed
MESSAGE FROM THE SENATE: CONCURRENCE # 4Completed




HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
APRIL 4, 2013
YEAS AND NAYS # 11
HOUSE BILLS PASSED IN THE SENATE
HB 228 The Speaker
HB 244 Ch., Judiciary Com.
HB 245 Ch., Judiciary Com.
HB 247 Ch., Judiciary Com.
HB 254 Allegany County Del.
HB 255 Allegany County Del.
HB 257 St. Mary's County Del.
HB 292 Ch., Judiciary Com.
HB 338 Del. Clippinger
HB 428 Del. K. Kelly
HB 443 Del. Dumais
HB 718 Del. Serafini
HB 752 Ch., Ways and Means
HB 797 Del. McIntosh
HB 804 Del. Hucker
HB 831 Del. Bohanan
HB 1127 Del. Jameson
HB 1349 Prince George's Del.
HB 1406 Howard County Del.
HB 1407 Howard County Del.


REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Distribution Date: APRIL 5, 2013
Second Reading Date: APRIL 5, 2013
Report Number: 13-019

Withdrawn by sponsor
HB 35 UNF Del K. Kelly Criminal Law - Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting a Handgun - Active Assignment Exception
HB 397 UNF Del McDermott, et al Criminal Law - Carrying Weapons on School Property - Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act
HB 1478 UNF Del Cardin, et al Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats

Unfavorable Report
HB 107 UNF Del Gutierrez, et al Firearms - Detachable Magazines - Maximum Capacity for Ammunition
HB 375 UNF Dels McIntosh and Hucker Rgltd Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's Lic - Rcd Keeping and Reporting Reqmts
HB 477 UNF Del Simmons Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
HB 490 UNF Del Mitchell, et al Crimes - Restricted Firearm Ammunition - Prohibition on Possession and Use
HB 643 UNF Del Boteler, et al Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Exemption from Training Course
HB 989 UNF Del Conaway Public Safety - High-Capacity Magazines - Exceptions
HB 1077 UNF Del Clippinger Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or Stolen
HB 1092 UNF Del Gutierrez Public Safety - Firearms - Reporting Loss or Theft
HB 1191 UNF Del Rosenberg, et al Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
MONDAY
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR NO. 50
HB 789 Del. Ivey STATUS: (Judiciary)
Vehicle Laws - Lawful Status Committee Amendments NOT ADOPTED.
Requirement - Repeal
(Maryland Highway Safety Act Favorable Report NOT ADOPTED.
of 2013)
Motion by Del. Vallario to make
Bill and Amendments a Special
Order of Business for Monday
at the appropriate time.
CARRIED.
BILL ON 2ND READING.


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
THURSDAY
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR NO. 61
SB 715 Sen. Ramirez STATUS: (Judiciary)
Maryland Highway Safety Act Favorable Report ADOPTED.
of 2013
Motion by Del. Vallario to make
Bill a Special Order of Business
for Thursday at the appropriate
time. CARRIED.
BILL ON 2ND READING.


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
THURSDAY
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR NO. 62
HB 929 Del. Malone STATUS: (Environmental Matters)
Motor Vehicles - Speed Favorable Report as Amended
Monitoring Systems - Local ADOPTED.
Jurisdictions
Floor Amendment by Del. Conaway.
ADOPTED.
Motion by Del. Smigiel to make
Bill as AMENDED a Special
Order of Business for Thursday
at the appropriate time. CARRIED.
BILL ON 2ND READING.


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
THURSDAY
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR NO. 63
SB 207 Sen. Brochin STATUS: (Environmental Matters)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Favorable Report as Amended
Monitoring and Work Zone ADOPTED.
Speed Control Systems
Motion by Del. Malone to make
Bill as Amended a Special Order
of Business for Thursday at the
appropriate time. CARRIED.
BILL ON 2ND READING.


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
MARCH 30, 2013
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 68
HB 801 Del. Tarrant Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative Penalties ENV


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
March 30, 2013
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 69
HB 1139 Del. Frush Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers ENV


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
MARCH 29, 2013
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 24
SB 4
(Amended)
Sen. Pugh State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records Checks APP
SB 63 Chair, EHE Com. Md Higher Ed Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions APP
SB 369 Sen. Edwards Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital APP
SB 458 Calvert Co. Senators Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds APP
SB 477
(Amended)
Sen. Jones-Rodwell State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service APP
SB 508 Sen. Shank Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds APP
SB 588 Carroll Co. Senators Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds APP
SB 686
(Amended)
Sen. Garagiola Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program APP
SB 752 Sen. Robey Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program APP
SB 764
(Amended)
Sen. Conway Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth APP
SB 841 The President Higher Education Fair Share Act APP


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
MARCH 29, 2013
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 25
SB 109 Sen. Kelley Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition JUD
SB 198 Sen. Frosh Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance JUD
SB 239 The President Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court JUD
SB 258 Sen. Shank Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime JUD
SB 332 Sen. Gladden Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies JUD
SB 489
(Amended)
Sen. Shank Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) JUD
SB 505
(Amended)
Sen. Zirkin Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail JUD
SB 536 Sen. Shank Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report JUD
SB 624
(Amended)
Sen. Pugh Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records JUD


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
MARCH 29, 2013
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 29
SB 86 Ch., Jud. Proceed. Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance JUD


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
March 30, 2013
CONCURRENCE CALENDAR # 3
HOUSE BILLS AMENDED IN THE SENATE

APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
HB 494 Calendar 7 State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service
HB 495 Calendar 6 State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
HB 863 Calendar 46 Higher Education Fair Share Act

ECON. MATTERS COMMITTEE
HB 342 Calendar 6 Homeowner's or Renter's Ins and Private Psgr Motor Vehicle Ins - Bundling Reqmt - Prohibited
HB 1072 Calendar 21 Alcoholic Beverages - City of Laurel - Sales by License Holders PG 308-13
HB 1205 Calendar 25 Study of Captive Insurers

ENVIR. MATTERS COMMITTEE
HB 88 Calendar 5 Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
HB 957 Calendar 41 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Indivs with Dsblts


HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
March 30, 2013
CONCURRENCE CALENDAR # 4
HOUSE BILLS AMENDED IN THE SENATE

WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
HB 328 Calendar 35 Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
HB 791 Calendar 23 Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
HB 813 Calendar 20 TF to Stdy the Impact of Expanding Cr & Noncredit Courses for Stdts wth Intellectl & Devmtl Dsblts
HB 1155 Calendar 23 Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game Proceeds

Top


Click to return on the top page