Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


House Agenda for Proceedings No. 27

Proceedings
FEBRUARY 13, 2014 - SESSION 1
HOUSE OF DELEGATES
ANNAPOLIS, MARYLAND
FEBRUARY 13, 2014
INTRODUCTORY HOUSE BILLS NO. 46
HB 1403 Del. Norman HOUSE RULES
HB 1404 Del. Nathan-Pulliam HOUSE RULES
HB 1405 Del. Nathan-Pulliam HOUSE RULES
HB 1406 Del. Kipke HOUSE RULES
HB 1407 Del. Holmes HOUSE RULES
HB 1408 Del. Wood HOUSE RULES
HB 1409 Del. McMillan HOUSE RULES
HB 1410 Del. Bromwell HOUSE RULES
HB 1411 Howard County Del. HOUSE RULES
HB 1412 Del. Bobo HOUSE RULES
HB 1413 Del. Rosenberg HOUSE RULES
HB 1414 Del. Vaughn HOUSE RULES
HB 1415 Montgomery Co. Del. HOUSE RULES
HB 1416 Del. Mitchell HOUSE RULES
HB 1417 Ch., Econ Matters Co HOUSE RULES
HB 1418 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1419 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1420 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1421 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1422 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1423 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1424 Del. Glass HOUSE RULES
HB 1425 Del. Conaway HOUSE RULES
HB 1426 Del. Walker HOUSE RULES
HB 1427 Del. Walker HOUSE RULES
HB 1428 Del. Walker HOUSE RULES
HB 1429 Del. Walker HOUSE RULES
HB 1430 Del. Hubbard HOUSE RULES
HB 1431 Del. Hubbard HOUSE RULES
Top
February 13, 2014
MESSAGE FROM THE SENATE # 16
SENATE BILLS INTRODUCED IN THE HOUSE
SB 231 Sen. Edwards Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection JUD
SB 294 The President Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation ENV
SB 407 Sen. Astle Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions ENV
Top
REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC MATTERS
Distribution Date: February 11, 2014
Second Reading Date: February 12, 2014
Report Number: 14-002

Favorable Report
HB 39 FWA Del Jameson Chesapeake Employers' Ins Company - Issuance, Renewal, and Cancellation of Policies - Authority
HB 202 FWA Del Barkley Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
HB 220 FWA Del Jameson Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists
HB 253 FAV The Spkr (DLS) State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
HB 254 FAV The Spkr (DLS) State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
HB 335 FAV Dels Schuh and Olszewski Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act)
HB 478 (Emergency Bill) FAV Del Davis Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification
HB 511 FAV Del Davis (DLS) State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Withdrawn by sponsor
HB 585 UNF Del Barnes Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child

Unfavorable Report
HB 78 UNF Del Carr Public Service Commission - Participant Compensation
HB 405 UNF Del Cardin, et al Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - Prohibited
Top
REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Distribution Date: February 11, 2014
Second Reading Date: February 12, 2014
Report Number: 14-002

Favorable Report
HB 13 FWA Chr HGO (Dept) Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Reg
HB 40 FWA Del Murphy State Government - Commemorative Months - Native American Heritage Month
HB 41 FWA Dels Murphy and Branch Maryland Native American Status - Standards for Recognition
HB 53 FWA Dels Vitale and Carr Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - Required
HB 101 FAV Del Kipke Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide - Repeal of Termination Date
HB 102 FAV Chr HGO (Dept) Procurement Advisory Council - Membership
HB 113 FWA Del Hubbard State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
HB 149 FAV Del Reznik Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits
HB 258 FAV The Spkr (DLS) St Bd of Audiologists, Hrg Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Lang Pthlgsts - Sunset Ext and Pgm Eval
HB 301 FWA Del Reznik Hlth Occups - Dentists With Prmts to Prepare and Dispense Den Prods - Exclusion From Md Phrmcy Act
HB 303 FWA Del Reznik Health Occuptns - Lic'd Dentists Who Prepare & Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Md Pharm Act

Withdrawn by sponsor
HB 111 UNF Del Hubbard Public Health - Newborn Screening Program - Lysosomal Storage Disorders
HB 547 UNF Del B. Robinson Minority Business Enterprises - Study and Report
HB 736 UNF Del Carter Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition
Top
February 12, 2014
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR NO. 2
HB 288 Del. O'Donnell STATUS: (Environmental Matters)
Transportation - Favorable Report ADOPTED.
Metropolitan Planning
Organizations - Notice and Motion by Del. Olszewski to make
Public Hearing Bill a Special Order of Business
for Wednesday, February 12, at
the appropriate time. CARRIED.
BILL ON 2ND READING.
Top
February 12, 2014
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 2
TO BE TAKEN UP ON THURSDAY, February 13, 2014
HB 222 Del. Dumais Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal Cruelty JUD
HB 242 Del. Jacobs Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County JUD
HB 249 Del. McMillan Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits ENV
HB 285
(Emergency Bill)
Dorchester Co. Del. Md Consoldtd Capital Bond Ln of 2013 - Dorchester Co - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment APP
HB 392 Del. Rudolph Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board - Revisions APP
HB 396 Del. F. Turner Comm on Accessibility Concepts in Cmptr Science, Info Systems, and Info Tech Pgms in Hghr Ed APP
Top
February 12, 2014
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING HOUSE BILLS # 3
TO BE TAKEN UP ON THURSDAY, February 13, 2014
HB 1 Ch., Judiciary Com. Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability JUD
HB 18 Del. Stein Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information APP
HB 121 Del. S. Robinson Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member Terms ENV
HB 129 Del. S. Robinson Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions ENV
HB 154 Del. O'Donnell Natural Resources - Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership ENV
HB 178 Ch., Judiciary Com. Fam Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Servs - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home Plcmnt JUD
HB 179 Ch., Judiciary Com. Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership JUD
Top
February 12, 2014
CALENDAR OF THIRD READING SENATE BILLS # 2
TO BE TAKEN UP ON THURSDAY, February 13, 2014
SB 152
(Emergency Bill)
Sen. Colburn Md Consoldtd Capital Bond Ln of 2013 - Dorchester Co - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment APP
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 14, 2014 10:30 A.M.
Click to return on the top page