Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


Senate Agenda for Proceedings No. 40

Proceedings
MARCH 6, 2014 - SESSION 1
REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON SENATE RULES
Distribution Date: March 6, 2014
Second Reading Date: March 6, 2014
Report Number: 14-009

Rereferred Report
SB 1100 TO B&T Sen Kasemeyer Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Arbutus Recreation Center Project
SB 1101 TO B&T Sen McFadden Md Consoldtd Capital Bond Lns of 2008 and 2011 - Baltimore Cty - Mary Harvin Transformation Ctr
Top
REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS
Distribution Date: March 4, 2014
Second Reading Date: March 5, 2014
Report Number: 14-013

Favorable Report
SB 248 FWA(2) Sen Frosh, et al Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations
SB 378 FAV Sen Conway Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
SB 389 FWA(3) Sen Robey Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
SB 607 FWA(3) Sen Shank, et al Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report and Training
SB 811 FWA(4) Sen Raskin Corpns and Assns - Md Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemps
SB 936 FWA(2) Cecil County Senators Cecil County - Salary of the Sheriff

Withdrawn by sponsor
SB 442 UNF Sen Colburn Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
SB 443 UNF Sen Colburn Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties

Unfavorable Report
SB 32 UNF Chr JPR (Md Jud Conf) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
SB 174 UNF Sen Brochin Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
SB 209 UNF Sen Kelley, et al Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
SB 281 UNF Sen Astle MVA - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
SB 387 (Emergency Bill) UNF Sen Reilly Drivers' Licenses, ID Cards, and Moped Operators' Prmts - Enhanced ID Documents
Top
March 6, 2014
58th Day of Session
SPECIAL ORDERS NO. 25
SB 141 Sen. Conway Tax Sales - Environmental Violations -
Liens on Real Property. 03/04/14
Reported Favorably with Amendments (2)
by the Committee on Budget & Taxation
and Laid Over under the Rule. 03/05/14
Made a Special Order for 03/06/14.
QUESTION IS ON THE ADOPTION OF THE COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (2)
AND THE FAVORABLE REPORT.
SB 611 Calvert Co. Senators Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages -
Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and
Liquor License. 03/05/14 Favorable
Report Adopted. Bill ordered printed for
Third Reading. Motion to reconsider the
vote by which the bill passed Second
Reading Adopted. Made a Special Order
for 03/06/14.
BILL IS ON SECOND READING AND OPEN TO AMENDMENT.
Top
Distribution Date: March 5, 2014
Third Reading Date: March 6, 2014
SENATE THIRD READING CALENDAR NO. 40
PUBLIC GENERAL LAWS AND RESOLUTIONS (SENATE BILLS)
SB 120 Chair, EHE Com. Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent Surrogates EHE
SB 413 Sen. Dyson Hlth Occups - Dentists With Prmts to Dispense Den Prods - Exclusion From Md Pharmacy Act EHE
SB 438 Sen. Mathias Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot EHE
SB 503 Sen. Pugh Pub Schs - Cardiopulmnry Resuscitation & Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law) EHE
SB 525 Sen. Shank Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties EHE
SB 610 Sen. Jennings National Guard - Tuition Assistance - Members of Disbanded Units EHE
SB 666 Sen. Pinsky Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program EHE
SB 700 Sen. Manno Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees EHE
SB 701 Sen. Madaleno Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information EHE
SB 747 Sen. Astle Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation EHE
SB 849 Sen. Conway St Bd of Nsg - Nurses, Nsg Assists, Med Techs, & Elctrlgsts - Licnsng, Certfn, Reg, Viols, & Pens EHE
SB 854 Sen. Conway State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns EHE
Top
Distribution Date: March 5, 2014
Third Reading Date: March 6, 2014
SENATE THIRD READING CALENDAR NO. 41
PUBLIC GENERAL LAWS AND RESOLUTIONS (SENATE BILLS)
SB 332 The President Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 B&T & EHE
SB 483 Sen. Klausmeier Lbr and Emplmt - Nursing Homes and Hlth Care Facs - Workplace Saf Assessment and Saf Program FIN
SB 572 Sen. King Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal Interest B&T
SB 585 Sen. Middleton Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith FIN
SB 605 Sen. Edwards Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation B&T
SB 606 Sen. Robey Developmental Disabilities Administration - Deputy Secretary - Establishment FIN
SB 613 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge B&T
SB 614 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Payment of Wages FIN
SB 615 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Gaming Permits B&T
SB 616 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land Trust B&T
SB 653 Sen. Astle Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program B&T
SB 882 Sen. Pugh Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Continuity of Care Advisory Panel FIN
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 11, 2014 9:55 A.M.
Click to return on the top page