Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

House Index

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number Photos
January 10, 2024 January 10, 2024 1 (Journalized)
January 11, 2024 January 11, 2024 2 (Journalized)
January 12, 2024 January 12, 2024 3 (Journalized)
January 15, 2024 January 15, 2024 4 (Journalized)
January 16, 2024 January 16, 2024 5 (Journalized)
January 17, 2024 January 17, 2024 6 (Journalized)
January 18, 2024 January 18, 2024 7 (Journalized)
January 19, 2024 January 19, 2024 8
January 22, 2024 January 22, 2024 9 (Journalized)
January 23, 2024 January 23, 2024 10 (Journalized)
January 24, 2024 January 24, 2024 11 (Journalized)
January 25, 2024 January 25, 2024 12 (Journalized)
January 26, 2024 January 26, 2024 13 (Journalized)
January 29, 2024 January 29, 2024 14 (Journalized)
January 30, 2024 January 30, 2024 15 (Journalized)
January 31, 2024 January 31, 2024 16 (Journalized)
February 1, 2024 February 1, 2024 17 (Journalized)
February 2, 2024 February 2, 2024 18
February 5, 2024 February 5, 2024 19 (Journalized)
February 6, 2024 February 6, 2024 20 (Journalized)
February 7, 2024 February 7, 2024 21 (Journalized)
February 8, 2024 February 8, 2024 22 (Journalized)
February 9, 2024 February 9, 2024 23 (Journalized)
February 12, 2024 February 12, 2024 24 (Journalized)
February 13, 2024 February 13, 2024 25 (Journalized)
February 14, 2024 February 14, 2024 26 (Journalized)
February 15, 2024 February 15, 2024 27 (Journalized)
February 16, 2024 February 16, 2024 28
February 19, 2024 February 19, 2024 29 (Journalized)
February 20, 2024 February 20, 2024 30 (Journalized)
February 21, 2024 February 21, 2024 31 (Journalized)
February 22, 2024 February 22, 2024 32
February 23, 2024 February 23, 2024 33
Proceedings
Calendar Date
January 10, 2024
Legislative Date
January 10, 2024
Proceedings Number
1 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 11, 2024
Legislative Date
January 11, 2024
Proceedings Number
2 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 12, 2024
Legislative Date
January 12, 2024
Proceedings Number
3 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 15, 2024
Legislative Date
January 15, 2024
Proceedings Number
4 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 16, 2024
Legislative Date
January 16, 2024
Proceedings Number
5 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 17, 2024
Legislative Date
January 17, 2024
Proceedings Number
6 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 18, 2024
Legislative Date
January 18, 2024
Proceedings Number
7 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 19, 2024
Legislative Date
January 19, 2024
Proceedings Number
8
Photos
Calendar Date
January 22, 2024
Legislative Date
January 22, 2024
Proceedings Number
9 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 23, 2024
Legislative Date
January 23, 2024
Proceedings Number
10 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 24, 2024
Legislative Date
January 24, 2024
Proceedings Number
11 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 25, 2024
Legislative Date
January 25, 2024
Proceedings Number
12 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 26, 2024
Legislative Date
January 26, 2024
Proceedings Number
13 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 29, 2024
Legislative Date
January 29, 2024
Proceedings Number
14 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 30, 2024
Legislative Date
January 30, 2024
Proceedings Number
15 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
January 31, 2024
Legislative Date
January 31, 2024
Proceedings Number
16 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 1, 2024
Legislative Date
February 1, 2024
Proceedings Number
17 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 2, 2024
Legislative Date
February 2, 2024
Proceedings Number
18
Photos
Calendar Date
February 5, 2024
Legislative Date
February 5, 2024
Proceedings Number
19 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 6, 2024
Legislative Date
February 6, 2024
Proceedings Number
20 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 7, 2024
Legislative Date
February 7, 2024
Proceedings Number
21 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 8, 2024
Legislative Date
February 8, 2024
Proceedings Number
22 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 9, 2024
Legislative Date
February 9, 2024
Proceedings Number
23 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 12, 2024
Legislative Date
February 12, 2024
Proceedings Number
24 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 13, 2024
Legislative Date
February 13, 2024
Proceedings Number
25 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 14, 2024
Legislative Date
February 14, 2024
Proceedings Number
26 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 15, 2024
Legislative Date
February 15, 2024
Proceedings Number
27 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 16, 2024
Legislative Date
February 16, 2024
Proceedings Number
28
Photos
Calendar Date
February 19, 2024
Legislative Date
February 19, 2024
Proceedings Number
29 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 20, 2024
Legislative Date
February 20, 2024
Proceedings Number
30 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 21, 2024
Legislative Date
February 21, 2024
Proceedings Number
31 (Journalized)
Photos
Calendar Date
February 22, 2024
Legislative Date
February 22, 2024
Proceedings Number
32
Photos
Calendar Date
February 23, 2024
Legislative Date
February 23, 2024
Proceedings Number
33
Photos
Last Updated: 2/23/2024 12:33 PM
Click to return on the top page