Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain deer donation expenses to include an individual who hunts and harvests an antlerless deer in Montgomery County and donates the deer carcass or processed deer meat to the Montgomery County Deer Donation Program; establishing a Venison Donation Grant Program to provide grants to defray the costs of butchering and processing deer that are donated to venison donation programs in the State; requiring the Department to approve applications in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {755068/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {339931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {755068/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {339931/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Recede 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page