Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders – Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning on January 1, 2020, to provide services for certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders under certain circumstances; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain health insurance benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment of certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance – Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders – Coverage
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-854 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page