Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Digital Fingerprint Record - Permit Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to take and maintain a set of digital fingerprints for each applicant for a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun; and specifying that a person who applies for the renewal of a handgun permit is not required to provide a set of fingerprints beyond the digital fingerprints required by a specified provision of law unless the Secretary expressly determines that the applicant must provide a new set of fingerprints to resolve a question of that applicant's identity.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/05/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-301, 5-305, 5-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page