Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman and Queen
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring institutions of postsecondary education to provide certain education loan information annually to each undergraduate student enrolled in the institution who applies for federal student aid in the applicable award year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0069
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2017
Legislative Date
10/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564061/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2017 10/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {564061/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
(   10-101, 18-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page