Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a person to conduct a home game that is a game of chance or skill involving wagering that is conducted in a person's home or a residential property restricted to housing for persons at least 55 years old and allows a player to compete directly against one or more other players; prohibiting a person from conducting a home game involving a player's use of an electronic device that connects to the Internet; and prohibiting a person from benefiting financially in any way, directly or indirectly, other than from specified winnings.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0157 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
5/26/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 5/26/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
12/17/2015 Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
(   12-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page