Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain procedural notice requirements must be fulfilled prior to the filing of a complaint by a landlord or a landlord's duly qualified agent for the repossession of residential rental property for failure to pay rent; requiring that, before a landlord may file a complaint to repossess property for the failure to pay rent, the landlord deliver certain written notice to a tenant; altering from the fifth to the seventh day following the filing of a complaint that at tenant much appear before the court; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0454
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {692910/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {122510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-40)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {692910/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {122510/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (91-40) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page