Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks and Barve
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the carbon dioxide emissions rate for certain affected electric generating units from exceeding 180 pounds per million British thermal units; establishing the Fossil Fuel Community Transition Fund to provide grants to certain individuals and communities; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to establish certain policies and procedures for the administration of the Fund; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to use the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund to provide certain funding; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0148
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2020
Legislative Date
10/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2020 10/31/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-10A-01 through 2-10A-03 )
(   11-1401 through 11-1405 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page