Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Central Collection Unit from collecting certain unpaid video tolls and associated civil penalties incurred by a person residing outside the State, except under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {893724/2 (Delegate Carr) Rejected
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Carr) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Floor Amendment {893724/2 (Delegate Carr) Rejected 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Finance 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page