Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Boyce, Bridges, Cardin, Crutchfield, Ivey, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, Palakovich Carr, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2020, a restaurant from providing a single-use plastic straw to a customer dining in at the restaurant unless the customer requests a straw; and providing the Act does not apply to restaurant services provided at a drive-through window.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   9-2101, 9-2108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page