Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a member of the House of Delegates from sponsoring more than 12 bills in a legislative session; authorizing a member of the House to introduce up to 3 bills in excess of a certain limit under certain circumstances; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
(   2-1502, 2-1502.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page